California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB482 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 30, 2023