California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB487 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 22, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023