|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 612, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 3050.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1172.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 893.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 712.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R., JUD., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|