Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1392.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1172.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 876.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 451.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|