LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB5
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB5
Action History
Senate
02/01/2024
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
05/03/2023
May 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 992.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
04/20/2023
Set for hearing May 3.
Senate
01/18/2023
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Senate
12/06/2022
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
Senate
12/05/2022
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.