Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 769.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |