Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 903.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 425.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Set for hearing March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |