Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1293.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 636.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|