|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2733.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 3147.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 1402.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 535.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|