|
07/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2541.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|