Assembly | 07/10/2023 | July 10 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2023 | July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2023 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1353.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1173.) (May 18). | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1043.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Set for hearing May 10. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | May 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 993.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |