California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill June 30, 2023
Bill June 12, 2023