Assembly
|
07/05/2023
|
July 5 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1301.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1173.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 792.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
March 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|