06/29/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/29/2023 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/23/2023 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2289.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2023 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 814.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 11). | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |