Assembly | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 962.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 684.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |