California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 3, 2024
Bill January 3, 2024