|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 859, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5739.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 5699.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5566.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6693.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Hart.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1341.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 1011.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|