|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 860, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 5791.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 6898.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 790.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|