Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 894.) (April 25). | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |