Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3263.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1364.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1175.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 545.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|