Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | January 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Set for hearing January 18. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 894.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Set for hearing April 25 in JUD. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |