|
07/21/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1917.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2427.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 962.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 683.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|