|
09/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1051.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 802.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|