Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2486.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 15. Page 2973.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 426.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/16/2022
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|