Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1012.) (May 2). | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |