Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | April 19 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 833.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |