California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB602 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill August 24, 2023
Bill June 7, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023