California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB605 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill September 5, 2023
Bill June 30, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023