California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill June 28, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023