LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB62
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB62
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB62
Action History
Senate
02/01/2024
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
03/28/2023
March 28 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 578.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
03/08/2023
Set for hearing March 28.
Senate
01/18/2023
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Senate
01/05/2023
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
Senate
01/04/2023
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.