Assembly | 09/01/2023 | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2023 | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 18). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 713.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |