|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3012.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
June 28 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1076.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 682.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|