Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 939.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 797.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|