California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill June 8, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023