|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2134.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 1. Page 2647.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1048.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 687.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 572.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|