Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | April 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |