California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB648 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill June 30, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023