Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2604.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2998.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1303.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 875.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|