California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB659 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill June 30, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023