California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 21, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023