|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 497, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2742.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3251.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3010.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1403.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 747.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|