Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 937.) (April 26). | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |