|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 498, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 3251.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 939.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|