|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 699, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2749.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2956.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1057.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 853.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 688.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|