LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB685
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB685
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB685
Action History
Senate
02/01/2024
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
04/26/2023
April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 898.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
04/13/2023
Set for hearing April 26.
Senate
03/01/2023
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Senate
02/17/2023
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
Senate
02/16/2023
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.