|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 445, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 5291.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 6379.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 3048.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3. Page 2971.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 2958.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Set for hearing January 9 in TRANS. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
January 9 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|