|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2686.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1180.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 800.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|