|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 864, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 5738.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 5699.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5566.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 6711.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1401.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 895.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 572.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|