|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 632, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2743.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3246.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1077.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1012.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|