Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2743.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 3250.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1206.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 937.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|